MD HB366 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1599
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a judge of the District Court or a judge of a circuit court, on a finding of good cause, to recall an arrest warrant issued by a District Court commissioner and issue a summons in its place.
Title
District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-1) |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1599 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |