MD HB365 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "community association" under specified provisions of law relating to the standing of specified community associations in Baltimore City to seek judicial relief for abatement of specified nuisances; prohibiting a community association from seeking nuisance abatement under specified conditions; altering the definition of "nuisance"; altering the definition of "local code violation"; repealing a requirement that a community association must file a bond with the court before seeking abatement; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Nuisance Abatement and Local Code Enforcement - Community
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Gladden) Adopted | |
2012-04-01 | Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted | |
2012-03-31 | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Senators Gladden, Brochin, and Frosh | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 628271/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Report 513726/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Delegates Glenn, Healey, and Hogan | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-03-30 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable with Amendments 520816/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Bonds
Civil Actions
Codes
Homeowners Associations
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nuisances
Baltimore City
Bonds
Civil Actions
Codes
Homeowners Associations
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nuisances