MD HB364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1531
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the Central Collection Unit to settle a debt or claim without suit; reducing the maximum amount of a certain fee that may be assessed and collected from a debtor under certain circumstances; and repealing a requirement that a certain fee be assessed and collected sufficient to cover certain collection and administrative costs.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Central Collection Unit - Powers
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1531 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Debt Collection
Fees
Procurement
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Debt Collection
Fees
Procurement
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |