MD HB360 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment made in a qualified innovation business, not to exceed $50,000, or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity; requiring a qualified investor to meet certain requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Commerce to administer the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; establishing the Maryland Angel Investor Tax Credit Reserve Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-12-22HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-10-16HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB246 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development5109(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10751(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback