MD HB360 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that authorize health maintenance organizations to offer a benefit package that provides specified limited benefits; repealing provisions of law that authorize a specified group health insurance policy to provide for the continuation of specified benefit provisions after the death of a specified individual; repealing provisions of law that entitle specified insured individuals whose coverage is terminated for a specified reason to specified individual insurance policies; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {256283/2 Report Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Death
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Work, Labor and Employment
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Work, Labor and Employment