MD HB36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a surface mining permittee, on the discovery of a sudden subsidence of the surface of the land, to immediately implement appropriate safety measures to protect public health and safety; requiring a surface mining permittee to permanently replace a water supply within a certain zone of dewatering influence within 45 days of the date on which the permittee knew of the water supply failure; authorizing a surface mining permittee to seek reimbursement for water supply replacement costs under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {954832/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-10-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Boundaries
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health
Hearings
Mining
Prices
Real Property
Safety
Water
Zoning and Planning
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health
Hearings
Mining
Prices
Real Property
Safety
Water
Zoning and Planning