MD HB36 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the participation goal from 0.5% to 5% for specified veteran-owned business enterprises for specified procurement contracts.
Title
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Participation Goal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-08-06 | House | Pre-filed |