MD HB36 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Planning to submit the State Development Plan and any substantial part or revision of the Plan to the General Assembly; prohibiting the Plan from being finalized until it is approved by an Act of the General Assembly; authorizing the General Assembly to modify the Plan as submitted by the Secretary; requiring the Governor to file with the Secretary of State the Plan, part of the Plan, or a revision to the Plan, together with specified comments, after enactment of a law that approves or modifies the Plan; etc.
Title
Department of Planning - State Development Plan - Approval or Modification by
Sponsors
Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-10-20 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0036.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0036f.pdf |