MD HB359 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Including data on pregnant and parenting students in the data collected, organized, managed, disaggregated, reported on, and analyzed by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; and altering the types of records excluded from the definition of "student data" for purposes of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Longitudinal Data System – Student Data – Pregnant and Parenting Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-27HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB437 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education24701(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback