MD HB356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB617
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue a Class A beer and light wine license for use in a supermarket that has been certified by the Prince George's County Council as being located within a food desert or food swamp; and specifying that the Board may issue only three specified licenses for use in any single legislative district.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 304-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB617 (Carry Over) 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |