MD HB352 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified health care practitioners to use teletherapy for a specified patient under specified circumstances; and requiring specified health occupations boards to adopt specified regulations on or before April 1, 2018, that, to the extent practicable, are uniform and nonclinical.
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senators Zucker, Salling, and Nathan-Pulliam |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2017-04-07 | House | Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young, and Miele |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-07 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2017-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634230/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876084/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Health Occupations
Identification
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Privacy
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Workers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Counselors
Health Occupations
Identification
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Privacy
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Workers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video