MD HB349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified wages paid by small businesses to qualified veteran employees; prohibiting a small business from claiming the credit for a qualified veteran employee who is hired to replace a laid-off or striking employee; requiring the Department of Commerce, on application of a small business, to issue a tax credit certificate under specified circumstances; providing that the total amount of credit certificates issued may not exceed $500,000; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {329033/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {165667/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce, Department of
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Veterans