MD HB349 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Pricing Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and merging the functions of the Committee with the Pricing and Selection Committee for the Employment Works Program; providing that the Committee shall ensure that supplies and services provided by Blind Industries and Services of Maryland or a community service provider create work opportunities for individuals who have a mental or physical disability; etc.
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234230/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {516286/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Vocational Rehabilitation
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Vocational Rehabilitation