MD HB347 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to evaluate and rank all best available nitrogen removal technologies for on-site sewage disposal systems to advise local governments and citizens of the State of approved technologies that qualify for funding under the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department to make available a specified evaluation and ranking on the Department's Web site; requiring the Department to provide evaluation and ranking information to a county, municipality, or State resident; etc.
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Evaluation and Ranking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2011-04-07 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (131-5) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Grants
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Prices
Public Information
Sewage
Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Grants
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Prices
Public Information
Sewage