MD HB346 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Harford County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights; providing that specified provisions of law relating to hearing board procedures and the finality of specified hearing board decisions do not apply in Harford County; and defining terms.
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {123329/1 Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Disclosure
Evidence
Harford County
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Public Safety
Records
Review Boards
Sheriffs
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Disclosure
Evidence
Harford County
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Public Safety
Records
Review Boards
Sheriffs
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment