MD HB345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Charles County to use the proceeds from the issuance of certain tax increment financing bonds for convention centers, conference centers, or visitors' centers, to maintain infrastructure improvements at the centers, and to market development district facilities; making certain financing, refinancing, and reimbursement contingent on the review and approval of the Board of County Commissioners of Charles County; authorizing Charles County to establish minority participation goals for development projects; etc.
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375062/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB431 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174
Subjects
Bonds
Charles County
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Special Taxing Districts
Tourism
Charles County
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Special Taxing Districts
Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 12 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |