MD HB344 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that voter registration applications used in the State to register to vote or to change specified information for a registered voter include a specified statement concerning registration with a political party and the voter's right to participate in primary elections, caucuses, or conventions for a political party; authorizing the continued use of specified voter registration applications after June 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Voter Registration - Affiliation With Political Party and Participation in Primary Election, Caucus, or Convention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {985466/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Political Parties
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting
Elections, State Board of
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Political Parties
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting