MD HB343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to facilitate strategic planning, manage a Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund, and coordinate economic development service delivery; requiring the Corporation, under certain circumstances, to award capital and operating financial assistance from the Fund to support certain purposes; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Authority in the Corporation; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB270 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-13 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Corporations
Credit
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Loans
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Corporations
Credit
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Loans
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 496 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0343?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0343f.pdf |