MD HB342 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1005

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring public schools and nonpublic schools that receive State funds to notify parents or guardians of all students involved in an incident of problematic sexual behavior by the close of business on the day of the incident; and requiring a county board to ensure that certain schools have a certain policy in place regarding a certain notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Student Behavior

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-29HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1005 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7424.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback