MD HB341 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified school vehicles in the State to be equipped with seat belts; prohibiting a person from operating school vehicles unless the person and each occupant are restrained by a seat belt; authorizing a local school system or a nonpublic school to establish policies regarding the restraint of pupils by seat belts on school vehicles; requiring the operator of a school vehicle to notify the local school system or the nonpublic school the student attends if the student fails to comply with seat belt requirements; etc

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-09HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback