MD HB340 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 3 to 4 years after an offense was committed, the statute of limitations for certain prosecutions related to violations of State election laws; imposing certain restrictions related to candidacies, political committee positions, and elected offices if a certain civil penalty has not been paid; altering enforcement mechanisms related to violations of State campaign finance laws, including the amount of certain civil penalties and the manner for imposing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-35) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623027/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB15 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Citations
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
District Courts
Elections
Fees
Fines
Laws and Ordinances
Lobbying
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Public Officials
Records
Salaries and Compensation
State Prosecutor
Statutes of Limitation
Summonses
Time
Trials
Citations
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
District Courts
Elections
Fees
Fines
Laws and Ordinances
Lobbying
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Public Officials
Records
Salaries and Compensation
State Prosecutor
Statutes of Limitation
Summonses
Time
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 332.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 14 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |