MD HB34 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an income tax return preparer who willfully prepares, assists in preparing, or causes the preparation of a false income tax return or claim for refund under specified circumstances is subject to a specified statute of limitations and may reserve a point or question for a specified judicial review.
Title
Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-10-01 | House | Pre-filed |