MD HB34 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim October as German-American Heritage Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe the month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage Month
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {664335/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {296488/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2012-10-16 | House | Pre-filed |