MD HB34 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-09 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-09 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court, under specified circumstances, on its own initiative or on a motion of a party, to receive additional evidence for a specified purpose after receiving a report of recommendations from the Office of Administrative Hearings regarding discharge from commitment of a person previously found not criminally responsible; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Discharge from Commitment of Person Previously Found Not
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable with Amendments 482817/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-04 | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-07-13 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Hearings
Mental Health
State Hospitals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Hearings
Mental Health
State Hospitals