MD HB336 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the forfeiture of specified property under specified circumstances; repealing a specified provision authorizing the forfeiture of specified money or weapons relating to possession of a controlled dangerous substance; requiring that a specified seizing authority provide a receipt for property on seizure that includes specified information; requiring that a specified seizing authority mail notice with specified information to the owner of seized property within a specified period of time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-18) (Y: 121 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-48) (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (121-18)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {708579/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (85-48)
2016-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {192910/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-02-09HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-27HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0336?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0336f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0336t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0336e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_619_hb0336e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0336_19291001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0336_70857901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0336.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0336_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0336_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0336_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0336,h-0617&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0336,h-1470&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0336,s-1368&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback