MD HB335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Montgomery County Council and the Prince George's County Council to grant an exemption from a system development charge imposed by the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission under specified circumstances for specified properties that are exempt from federal taxation and the primary mission and purpose of which are to provide programs and services to youth, for properties that are primarily used for child care or after-school care, or for properties primarily used for programs and services for developmentally disabled persons; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment {464132/1 Withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {530711/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Bi-County Agencies
Child Care
Community Facilities and Services
County Councils
Developmental Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Youth
Bi-County Agencies
Child Care
Community Facilities and Services
County Councils
Developmental Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Youth