MD HB335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a specified residential cliffside elevator to the elevators that require specified registration and inspection; requiring a specified cliffside elevator to have a specified inspection on a specified periodic basis; altering the term "elevator unit" to include a cliffside elevator for purposes of provisions of law relating to elevator safety; and defining "cliffside elevator".
Title
Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |