MD HB335 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the criteria used to determine the eligibility of a member of the State Retirement and Pension System to receive service credit for military service so as to require 10 years of service credit in the State Retirement and Pension System through employment as a member of a State system.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-10 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-03-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-02-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Appropriations |