MD HB334 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations that require public schools that are newly constructed or completely renovated and occupied on or after January 1, 2013, to include a gymnasium and adequate support space for physical education instruction and to adopt guidelines for facilities for physical education programs; providing for a process to request a waiver based on land or zoning constraints; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Physical Education Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Bartlett [R] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. D Page Elmore [R] | Del. William Frick [D] |
Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (38-9) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Special Order 3/17 (Delegate Walkup) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation