MD HB333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB195
Note: Carry Foward to future HB851
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1533
Note: Carry Foward to future HB851
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual who is employed by a county or municipality in the State to perform marine contractor services while in the performance of the duties of their employment without having to obtain a marine contractor license under certain circumstances; and exempting certain individuals who perform marine contractor services while in the performance of the duties of their employment from paying a fee for the issuance or renewal of a license or a test administered by the Board.
Title
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Sponsors
Del. Jerry Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {760013/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB333 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB333 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1533 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB333 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1533 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 17 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |