MD HB333 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the motor vehicle offense of aggressive driving to include the commission of a specified number of an alternate set of specified motor vehicle offenses under specified circumstances; and establishing that specified persons charged with a violation for aggressive driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-7) |
2017-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180818/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road