MD HB333 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Human Resources to establish the Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program in the Department of Human Resources; requiring the Program to be established for 100 couples in at least three counties in the State; requiring the Secretary to cooperate with specified persons on the establishment of the Program; requiring the implementation of specified policies and procedures in local departments of social services; requiring the Secretary to report on the Program annually to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-4) |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {244960/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Education
Federal Government
Grants
Human Resources, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Security
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Welfare
Counties
Education
Federal Government
Grants
Human Resources, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Security
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Welfare