MD HB332 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; removing certain sources from the definition of a "Tier 1 renewable source"; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |