MD HB332 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell essential goods and services during a state of emergency for a price of more than 20% above the price charged by that person for those goods and services not more than 60 days or less than 4 days before the state of emergency; creating specified exceptions; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-44) |
2013-03-25 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393196/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-19 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Construction
Consumer Protection
Drugs
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Food
Fuel
Health
Home Improvement
Housing
Notices
Prices
Public Safety
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
Storage
Transportation
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Construction
Consumer Protection
Drugs
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Food
Fuel
Health
Home Improvement
Housing
Notices
Prices
Public Safety
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
Storage
Transportation
Unfair Trade Practices