MD HB331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a police officer from questioning a certain minor unless an attorney for the minor is physically present with the minor or communicating with the minor through live, two-way electronic and audio communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-15HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-22HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure2109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback