MD HB331 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the State Department of Education and the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission jointly to develop guidelines for public schools regarding the administration of medical cannabis to certain students during school hours and school-sponsored after-school activities; providing for the contents of the guidelines; requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the Department and the Commission jointly to provide certain technical assistance to schools; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – Medical Cannabis – Guidelines for Administration to Students (Connor’s Courage)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-02-04HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB605 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7446(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback