MD HB330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified provisions of law concerning the advertising for bids for procurements costing more than $25,000 applicable to construction or repair for public school projects in the State; and including construction and repair services under provisions of law concerning the award of procurement contracts, as specified.
Title
County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School Projects
Sponsors
Del. Adrienne Jones [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Advertising
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Real Property
State Government - Procurement
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Real Property
State Government - Procurement