MD HB33 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Climate Crisis Initiative in the Department of the Environment for certain purposes; establishing a greenhouse gas reduction target of 60% from 2006 levels by 2030 and net-zero by 2045; establishing a Climate Crisis Council to develop a plan to reach the reduction targets and submit it to the General Assembly by December 31, 2022; requiring the Council to have the plan verified in a certain manner; requiring a greenhouse gas pollution fee on all fossil fuels brought into the State for combustion in the State; etc.
Title
Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB76 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Subjects
Agriculture
Budgets
Buses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fuel
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Mass Transit
meetings
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Budgets
Buses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fuel
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Mass Transit
meetings
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1224 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |