MD HB33 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a certain person from intentionally and maliciously inflicting severe emotional distress on a vulnerable adult; and applying a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {322114/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-01-09HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-09-04HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB153 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law3605(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback