MD HB33 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain disabled person to apply for voluntary admission to a mental facility if the person submits a formal written application and either a physician and a psychologist, two physicians, or a physician and a psychiatric nurse practioner provide a certain certification; requiring the facility to notify the guardian of the person of a disabled person that the disabled person has been admitted to the facility and of a certain request for discharge from the facility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 760
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {976987/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-01-18HouseHearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2017-08-01HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback