MD HB33 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified professional counselor or therapist from engaging in a sexual act or vaginal intercourse with a person who is receiving counseling from the professional counselor or therapist or received counseling from the professional counselor or therapist within a specified period of time; providing a 3-year statute of limitations for the prosecution of a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {342911/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-10-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Health Occupations
Marriage
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Substance Abuse
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Health Occupations
Marriage
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Substance Abuse