MD HB328 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a default inclusion as an optional retirement program annuity contract provider of a company designated by a governing board of an employing institution on or before a specified date; altering the definition of "designated company" to mean one that is designated by the Board of Trustees; and providing the Board of Trustees may designate not more than five companies from which annuity contracts are to be purchased under the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contract Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
2017-03-29SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {544061/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-08HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0328&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0328f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0328t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_276_hb0328t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0328_54406101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0328.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0328_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0328_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0328,h-0503&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0328,s-1052&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback