MD HB326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the short title "Jordan McNair Act" for Subtitle 16 of Title 11 of the Education Article.
Title
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB27 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502