MD HB324 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB550

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from 10 grams to 1 ounce, the amount of marijuana below which possession is a civil offense, rather than a criminal offense; and creating a presumption that a person in possession of less than 1 ounce of marijuana is not in violation of a certain provision of law with regard to marijuana in the absence of any other evidence of a certain violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (94-36)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-06-16HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB143 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
HB550 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-33(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law5601(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law5601.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law5602(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback