MD HB324 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of postaudit examinations of the Environmental Trust Fund be an operating cost of the Environmental Trust Fund; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the audits of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund be paid from the 9-1-1 Trust Fund as an administrative cost; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the postaudit examinations of the Universal Service Trust Fund be paid from the Universal Service Trust Fund as an administrative cost; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {954632/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-14SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-10HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB301 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources3302(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1309(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A506(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government21220(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback