MD HB324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $10,000 the maximum fine that may be imposed for specified offenses relating to voting.
Title
Elections - Offenses Relating to Voting - Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Ronald George [R] |
Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Del. Steven Schuh [R] |
Del. Kelly Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {995966/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |