MD HB324 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Cecil County to the list of jurisdictions in which the holder of a Class 6 pub-brewery license may sell malt beverages for off- premises consumption in sealed refillable containers under specified circumstances.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery Licenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Economic Matters |