MD HB321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB10
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that changing facilities suitable for changing the diaper of a child and providing personal care for an adult be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings by October 1, 2022; requiring certain entities to report to 2-1-1 Maryland, Inc., the location of changing facilities when changing facilities are installed; requiring 2-1-1 to maintain a list of changing facilities on its website; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt certain standards; etc.
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-07-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB61 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
HB10 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB10 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Boundaries
Construction
Disabilities
Equipment
Gender
internet
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
restrooms
Social Services
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Age
Boundaries
Construction
Disabilities
Equipment
Gender
internet
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
restrooms
Social Services
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |