MD HB321 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified buyer or beneficiary of a pre-need contract to contact the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors and request the Board to conduct an audit of specified licensees; requiring the Board to conduct a specified audit within 30 days after a specified request; requiring a specified disclosure statement for a pre-need contract to state that the buyer or beneficiary of the pre-need contract is authorized to contact the Board and request a specified audit; etc.
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] |
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Privacy
Records
Reports