MD HB320 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "community association" for purposes of certain provisions of law authorizing community associations to seek judicial relief for nuisance abatement in Baltimore County; repealing a provision of law requiring a certain court to determine in what amount and under what conditions a bond must be filed by a community association in a certain nuisance action; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {440212/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback